IL SJRCA0011 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Finance Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for biennial budgets and appropriations. Defines a "fiscal biennium" as July 1 of each odd-numbered year though June 30 of the ensuing odd-numbered year. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-BIENNIAL BUDGET
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-29 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=11&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0011.htm |