IL SJRCA0010 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of members of the General Assembly must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes, (ii) the General Assembly shall convene each year on the first day of December (excluding Saturday and Sunday), and (iii) the General Assembly may not be in session in any general election year from the date of the general election until the first day of December (excluding Saturday and Sunday), except to respond to an act of God, act of terrorism, or other imminent threat to the safety or security of the people of the State or the United States of America. Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes in accordance with specified provisions and (ii) the Governor and Lieutenant Governor shall hold office for four years beginning on first day of December (excluding Saturday and Sunday). Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-GA/GOV TAKE OFFICE
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Sen. Darin LaHood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Postponed in Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=10&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJRCA/09800SC0010.htm |