IL SJRCA0004 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature and Executive Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a person may not be elected to the office of State Senator for more than three terms or the office of State Representative for more than five terms, and that service in the General Assembly before the second Wednesday in January of 2023 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Provides that a person may not be elected to any Executive Branch office, or any combination of Executive Branch offices, for more than 2 terms, and that service in an Executive Branch office before the second Monday in January of 2023 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-02-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback