IL SJRCA0003 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Limits a person's service in the office of Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House, or Minority Leader of the Senate to ten years in any one office. Effective upon being declared adopted and applies to service on or after the second Wednesday in January, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND- LEGISLATURE LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback