IL SJRCA0002 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for a referendum to reject any Public Act by a petition signed by a number of electors. Provides signature and content requirements for the petition. Provides requirements for the validity and sufficiency of petitions. Provides that if a petition is valid and sufficient, the proposed referendum shall be submitted to the electors at the general election specified in the petition. Provides that if the voters in a specified election reject a Public Act, it shall cease to be in effect on the date specified in the referendum. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-REF ON LEGISLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-02-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback