IL SJRCA0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes a provision that provides that a tax on income shall be measured at a non-graduated rate. Provides that there may be one tax on the income of individuals and corporations (currently, there may be no more than one income tax imposed on individuals and one income tax imposed on corporations, and the rate of tax imposed upon corporations shall not exceed the rate imposed on individuals by more than a ratio of 8 to 5). Provides that the income tax may be a fair tax where lower rates apply to lower income levels and higher rates apply to higher income levels. Provides that no government other than the State may impose a tax on or measured by income. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-INCOME TAX RATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Amendments in House (Y: 73 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-27SenateAdopted Both Houses
2019-05-27House3/5 Vote Required
2019-05-27HouseVerified
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-044-000
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-27HouseRead in Full a Third Time
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-20HouseRead in Full a Second Time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseRead in Full a First Time
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-01HouseArrived in House
2019-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-019-000
2019-05-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-04-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-12SenateRead in Full a Third Time
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2019; Constitutional Amendments
2019-04-11SenateRead in Full a Second Time
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 11, 2019; Constitutional Amendments
2019-04-10SenateRead in Full a First Time
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading Constitutional Amendments
2019-04-10SenateBe Adopted as Amended Executive; 012-005-000
2019-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-09SenateVerified
2019-04-09SenateWaive Posting Notice 036-015-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-04-09SenateAssignments Re-refers to Executive
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback