IL SJRCA0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
Pending: Senate Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes a provision that provides that a tax on income shall be measured at a non-graduated rate. Provides that there may be one tax on the income of individuals and corporations (currently, there may be no more than one income tax imposed on individuals and one income tax imposed on corporations, and the rate of tax imposed upon corporations shall not exceed the rate imposed on individuals by more than a ratio of 8 to 5). Provides that the income tax may be a fair tax where lower rates apply to lower income levels and higher rates apply to higher income levels. Provides that no government other than the State may impose a tax on or measured by income. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-INCOME TAX RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback