IL SJRCA0001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes a provision that provides that a tax on income shall be measured at a non-graduated rate. Provides that there may be one tax on the income of individuals and corporations (currently, there may be no more than one income tax imposed on individuals and one income tax imposed on corporations, and the rate of tax imposed upon corporations shall not exceed the rate imposed on individuals by more than a ratio of 8 to 5). Provides that the income tax may be a fair tax where lower rates apply to lower income levels and higher rates apply to higher income levels. Provides that no government other than the State may impose a tax on or measured by income. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-INCOME TAX RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017; Constitutional Amendments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read in Full a First Time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2017; Constitutional Amendments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SJRCA/10000SC0001.htm |