IL SJRCA0001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes a provision that provides that a tax on income shall be measured at a non-graduated rate. Provides that there may be one tax on the income of individuals and corporations (currently, there may be no more than one income tax imposed on individuals and one income tax imposed on corporations, and the rate of tax imposed upon corporations shall not exceed the rate imposed on individuals by more than a ratio of 8 to 5). Provides that the income tax may be a fair tax where lower rates apply to lower income levels and higher rates apply to higher income levels. Provides that no government other than the State may impose a tax on or measured by income. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-INCOME TAX RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-02-09SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback