IL SJR0050 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States and the Congress of the United States to take all necessary measures to ensure the last surviving Medal of Honor recipient from World War II be offered a state funeral.
Title
MEDAL OF HONOR-STATE FUNERAL
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-11-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=50&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0050.htm |