IL SJR0044 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the first full week of March 2022 as "Illinois Soil Health Week" and the Wednesday of that week as "Illinois Soil Health Day".
Title
SOIL HEALTH WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] |
Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-03-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=44&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SJR/10200SJ0044.htm |