IL SJR0040 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 6-10, 2019 as "Teacher Appreciation Week" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TEACHER APPRECIATION WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-09HouseArrived in House
2019-05-09SenateResolution Adopted
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback