IL SJR0028 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the entire portion of U.S. Highway 20 in Illinois beginning at the Illinois/Iowa border and ending at the Illinois/Indiana border as the "Illinois Medal of Honor Highway".
Title
MEDAL OF HONOR HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-01-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-10-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-10-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-06-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-06-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |