IL SJR0027 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 3 in Waterloo from GG Road to Kaskaskia Road as the "Trooper Nick Hopkins Memorial Highway".
Title
TROOPER HOPKINS MEMORIAL HGWAY
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. David Friess [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-10-28 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-10-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-10-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-06-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |