IL SJR0026 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Rescinds Illinois' ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESCIND-CORWIN AMENDMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-02HouseArrived in House
2019-05-02SenateResolution Adopted; 055-000-000
2019-05-02Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Plummer
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateBe Adopted as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-21SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback