IL SJR0018 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Automated Dialing and Solicitation Task Force to review the Telephone Solicitations Act (815 ILCS 413/) and develop ideas to update the Act.
Title
AUTO DIALING TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 048-000-000 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Telecommunications and Information Technology; 005-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |