IL SJR0017 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Illinois Route 49 from US Route 36 to Illinois Route 133 as the "Roger Busby Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROGER BUSBY MEMORIAL HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-03SenateAdopted Both Houses
2024-05-03HouseResolution Adopted 093-000-000
2024-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
2024-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2024-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2024-04-10HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 014-000-000
2024-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
2023-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2023-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2023-05-24HouseArrived in House
2023-05-24SenateResolution Adopted; 057-000-000
2023-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2023-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-02SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback