IL SJR0006 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Route 113 from Carbon Hill Road to Virginia Street in Coal City as the "Dennis M. Neary Memorial Highway".
Title
DENNIS NEARY MEM HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-04 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-06-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |