IL SJR0001 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED SECOND GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Wednesday, January 13, 2021, the Senate stands adjourned until Wednesday, January 20, 2021, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 26, 2021, or until the call of the President; and the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 02, 2021, or until the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-14 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2021-01-14 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-01-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Andy Manar; 3-6(a) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SJR/10200SJ0001.htm |