IL SB4188 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall adopt and implement rules to adjust licensing requirements, including, but not limited to, worker qualifications for child care providers within child care deserts that reflect local labor market conditions in order to grant local child care providers enhanced hiring flexibility and expand child care into currently underserved areas. Defines "child care deserts" and "child care provider". Provides that the Department shall submit proposed rules to implement the provisions concerning emergency licensing to the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules no later than December 31, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE DESERTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4188&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4188.htm |