IL SB4164 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certain food, drugs, and medical appliances that were taxed at the rate of 1% shall be exempt from the taxes under those Acts. Provides that certain amounts shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to certain local tax funds. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-RATE-FOOD AND MEDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4164&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4164.htm |