IL SB4161 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the additional standard exemption for taxpayers who have attained the age of 65 before the end of the taxable year and spouses of such taxpayers is $2,000 for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022 (currently, $1,000). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STANDARD EXEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4161&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4161.htm |