IL SB4160 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district shall reduce its aggregate extension base for the purpose of lowering its limiting rate for future years upon referendum approval initiated by the submission of a petition by the voters of the district. Provides that the extension limitation shall be: (a) the lesser of 5% or the average percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for the 10 years immediately preceding the levy year for which the extension limitation is being calculated; or (b) the rate of increase approved by the voters. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4160&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4160.htm |