IL SB4156 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $125,000,000 from the Fund the Police Grant Fund to the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board for grants to units of local government for all expenses related to the administration of the statutory provisions of the Fund the Police Act. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$FUND THE POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4156&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB4156.pdf |