IL SB4152 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for bringing contraband into a penal institution committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a prisoner serving a sentence for bringing contraband into a penal institution shall receive no additional sentence credit under the Code. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for aggravated battery in which the victim was a peace officer committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment.
Title
CORRECTIONS-CONTRABAND-BATTERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4152&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4152.htm |