IL SB4056 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 102-466 to change the effective date of certain provisions. Amends the School Code. Makes changes concerning State Board of Education reporting, references to the Certification of Teachers Article and certification, reporting attacks on school personnel, the Annual State Report on Special Education Performance, the High-Cost Special Education Funding Commission, the evidence-based funding formula, a part-time provisional career and technical educator endorsement or a provisional career and technical educator endorsement on an educator license with stipulations, the heroin and opioid drug prevention pilot program, the Emotional Intelligence and Social and Emotional Learning Task Force, and the limitation on noninstructional costs in the Chicago school district. Repeals provisions concerning the Downstate School Finance Authority for Elementary Districts Law, an alternative education program audit adjustment prohibition, high-skilled manufacturing teaching resources, entrepreneurial skills teaching resources, a job training program prohibition, the Giant Steps Autism Center for Excellence pilot program, fast growth grants, and the Alternative Route to Administrative Certification for National Board Certified Teachers. Amends the School Safety Drill Act. Adds a charter school authorized by the State Board of Education and a special education cooperative to the definition of "school" and requires a charter school to have threat assessment procedures. Amends the Property Tax Code, Illinois Pension Code, and Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act to make related changes. Amends the College and Career Success for All Students Act to make a technical change. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOLS-MISCELLANEOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0894 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Effective Date May 20, 2022 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |