IL SB4029 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that a certificate of stillbirth shall be prepared after a fetal death that occurs in this State after a gestation period of at least 20 (rather than 26) completed weeks, only upon request by the woman who delivered the stillborn fetus.
Title
VITAL RECORDS-CERTIFICATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4029&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4029.htm |