IL SB4025 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In a provision concerning Inspector General reports to the Department of Public Health's Health Care Worker Registry, requires the Inspector General to report the identity and finding of each employee of a facility or agency against whom there is a final investigative report prepared by the Inspector General that contains a substantiated allegation of physical or sexual abuse, financial exploitation, or egregious neglect of an individual, unless the Inspector General requests a stipulated disposition of the investigative report that does not include the reporting of the employee's name to the Health Care Worker Registry and the Secretary of Human Services agrees with the requested stipulated disposition. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-HEALTH CARE REGISTRY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0883 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |