IL SB3989 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-17 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the COVID-19 Immunity Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, any individual, business, or unit of local government shall not be liable for any civil damages for any acts or omissions that result in the transmission of COVID-19, other than damages occasioned by willful and wanton misconduct by the individual, business, or unit of local government. Provides that, with the exception of willful and wanton misconduct, a health care provider shall be immune from civil liability for any injury or death relating to the diagnosis, transmission, or treatment of COVID-19 alleged to have been caused by any act or omission by the health care provider, which injury or death occurred at a time when health care provider was providing health care services consistent with current guidance issued by the Department of Public Health. Provides that the Act applies to any cause of action arising on or after January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 IMMUNITY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2020-06-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2020-06-24SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-05-24SenateRule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020
2020-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020
2020-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-05-19SenateFirst Reading
2020-05-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback