IL SB3957 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0872
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0872
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that elections to the Board for teacher trustees, administrator trustees, and pensioner trustees shall occur during the first week of November or as soon as possible thereafter, but not later than the third week of November (instead of occurring during the first week of November). Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-TRUSTEE ELECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0872 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-138 | Amended Code | Citation Text |