IL SB3939 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Modifies the exemptions from inspection and copying concerning cybersecurity vulnerabilities. Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act. Requires a local government official or employee to be chosen to act as the primary point of contact for local cybersecurity issues. Amends the Illinois Information Security Improvement Act. Requires the Secretary of Innovation and Technology to establish a cybersecurity liaison program to advise and assist units of local government and school districts concerning specified cybersecurity issues. Provides for cybersecurity training for employees of counties, municipalities, and school districts. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that State agencies are prohibited from purchasing any products that, due to cybersecurity risks, are prohibited for purchase by federal agencies pursuant to a United States Department of Homeland Security Binding Operational Directive.
Title
CYBERSECURITY-INFORMATION TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0753 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1370 | 1-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1375 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1375 | 5-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 25-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |