IL SB3910 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Prescription Drug Information Card Act. Provides that a uniform prescription drug information card issued by a health benefit plan shall display on the card the regulatory entity that holds authority over the plan, whether the plan is fully insured or self-insured, the issuer's National Association of Insurance Commissioners company code, any deductible applicable to the plan, any out-of-pocket maximum limitation applicable to the plan, and a toll-free telephone number and Internet website address through which the cardholder may seek consumer assistance information. Provides that a discounted health care services plan administrator shall issue to its beneficiaries a card that contains information about the regulatory entity that holds authority over the plan and whether the plan is fully insured or self-insured. Amends the Uniform Health Care Service Benefits Information Card Act. Provides that a health care benefit information card or other technology containing uniform health care benefit information issued by a health benefit plan or a dental plan shall specifically identify and display on the card the regulatory entity that holds authority over the plan, whether the plan is fully insured or self-insured, the issuer's National Association of Insurance Commissioners company code, any deductible applicable to the plan, any out-of-pocket maximum limitation applicable to the plan, and a toll-free telephone number and Internet website address through which the cardholder may seek consumer assistance information. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
INS-UNIFORM INFORMATION CARDS
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Eric Mattson [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] |
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0902 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Eric Mattson |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 7, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2022-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 30, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 138 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 139 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |