IL SB3908 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 1, and makes the following changes: In provisions concerning members of the Advisory Board to the Department of Natural Resources, provides that one member of the Board shall represent outdoor powersport usage interests, one shall be a member of a statewide association of trappers and represent trapping interests, and 3 members of the Board, whose interests are not otherwise specified, shall be residents of this State. In provisions concerning formulation and presentation of recommendations by the Board, removes the conservation of privately owned land from the category of protection and conservation of renewable resources of the State.
Title
DNR-ABOLISH ADVISORY BOARD
Sponsors
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1114 |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2023 |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-12-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-11-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-040-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-22 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-003-000 |
2022-03-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-014-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; D. Turner |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-003-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 005-003-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 5-560 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
525 | 33 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
525 | 33 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |