IL SB3907 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2010, as follows: General Funds $2,524,600; Other State Funds $7,353,200; Federal Funds $111,900,000;Total $121,777,800.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$CJIA FY11 OCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-12 Session Sine Die
2010-06-27 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2010-03-12 Assigned to Appropriations I
2010-03-11 Referred to Assignments
2010-03-11 First Reading
2010-03-11 Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2010-03-11 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback