IL SB3853 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program Act. Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program within the Division of Mental Health of the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Program shall provide bridge rental subsidies for individuals at high risk of unnecessary institutionalization and individuals at high risk of overdose for purposes of stabilizing their mental illness or substance abuse disorder. Provides criteria for the award, computation, and payment of bridge rental subsidies. Sets forth the responsibilities of persons receiving from bridge rental subsidies. Provides for the identification and referral to the Program of persons eligible to receive bridge rental subsidies prior to their discharge from a hospital or release from a correctional facility. Provides standards for housing service providers, long-term housing, and temporary rental units. Provides that the Department will contract with an independent outside research organization to evaluate the Program's effectiveness, and shall report the results of the evaluation to the General Assembly after 5 years. Provides rulemaking authority. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
HOUSING IS RECOVERY PILOT PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3853&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3853.htm |