IL SB3848 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the Central Management Services ordinary and contingent expenses of the Department of Central Management Services for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2010, as follows: General Funds $74,828,800; Other State Funds $969,576,500; Federal Funds $20,000,000; Total $1,064,405,300.
Title
$CMS FY11 OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-12 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3848&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB3848.pdf |