IL SB3845 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0863
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vocational Education Act. Requires the Gender Equity Advisory Committee, on or before December 15, 2023, to submit recommendations to the Governor, General Assembly, and State Board of Education on how school districts and the State Board of Education can better support historically disadvantaged males, including African American students and other students of color, to ensure educational equity. Makes that requirement inoperative on and after December 31, 2023.
Title
SCH CD-WHOLE CHILD TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0863 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Johnson |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |