IL SB3812 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $3,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for the School and Municipal Social Work Shortage Loan Repayment Program . Appropriates $3,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for Post-Master of Social Work School Social Work Professional Educator License scholarship s . Effective July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ISAC-SCH SOCIAL WORKER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-04-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa
2024-02-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2024-02-20SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback