IL SB3802 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning seat safety belts.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-005-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-04-30 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3802&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3802.htm |