IL SB3795 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the County Design-Build Authorization Division in the Counties Code. Provides that a county may enter into design-build contracts. Includes scope and performance criteria for design-build contracts, a two-phase procedure for selection of contracts, requirements for submission of proposals, procedures for awarding contracts, and requirements of reports and evaluation of contracts. Provides that, if the total overall cost of a project is estimated to be less than $12,000,000, the county may combine the two-phase procedure for selection into one phase. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
COUNTY DESIGN-BUILD AUTH ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-05 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-05 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-45001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | Div. 5-45 headin | New Code | See Bill Text |