IL SB3793 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0859
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0859
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds community service as a penalty for failing to stop before meeting or overtaking a school bus that is stopped for the purpose of receiving or discharging pupils and has displayed visual signals. Adds community service as a penalty for driving a motor vehicle at a speed in excess of 20 miles per hour while passing a school zone or while traveling on a roadway on public school property or upon any public thoroughfare where children pass going to and from school during a school day.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL SAFETY-PENALTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0859 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-09 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |