IL SB3790 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to annually include information about the Child Care Assistance Program and the federal dependent care allowance in the language that schools are required to provide to students eligible for Monetary Award Program grants. Specifies the information that must be included. Provides that an institution of higher learning that participates in the Monetary Award Program shall provide, at a minimum, the information to all students who are enrolled, or who are accepted for enrollment and are intending to enroll, and who have been identified by the Commission as Monetary Award Program-eligible at the institution. Provides that an institution of higher learning shall also provide the information to any student identified by the institution of higher learning as a student with dependents. Provides that an institution of higher learning may designate a public benefits liaison or single point person to assist students in taking the necessary steps to obtain public benefits if eligible. Requires the Commission to adopt rules to implement the provisions on or before October 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-CHILD CARE RESOURCES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2020-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2020-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2020-03-12SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2020-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2020-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2020-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2020-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2020-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2020-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094722New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback