IL SB3786 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. In provisions concerning the ABLE account program, provides that a "designated representative" means a person or entity (currently, person only) who is authorized to act on behalf of a "designated beneficiary". Provides that a designated representative must provide certification, subject to penalties of perjury, of the basis for the person's authority to act as a designated representative and that there is no other person or entity with higher priority to establish the ABLE account. Removes provisions allowing the State Treasurer to recognize specified persons or entities as a designated representative without appointment by a court. Defines "Internal Revenue Code". Effective immediately.
Title
STATE TREASURER-ABLE ACCOUNTS
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1024 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Rule 5-1(b) Consent is given to Senator Connor to present bill. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |