IL SB3785 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0857
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0857
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a person may transfer to a fund established under the Downstate Police Article creditable service accumulated under IMRF for service as a county correctional officer upon payment to the police pension fund of a specified amount to be determined by the board. Provides that any person applying to transfer service under the provisions may reinstate credits and creditable service under IMRF that were terminated upon receipt of a separation benefit by paying to IMRF the amount of the separation benefit plus interest thereon at the actuarially assumed rate of interest to the date of payment. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF TO ART 3-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0857 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-110.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-139.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |