IL SB3778 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Adds investigators for the Secretary of State and arson investigators to provisions that authorize a person to elect to establish eligible creditable service under the alternative retirement annuity formula for up to 5 years of certain service. Provides that an investigator for the Secretary of State may elect to convert service credit earned under the Article to eligible creditable service under the alternative annuity formula by filing a written election with the Board within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act and paying a specified contribution. In provisions requiring an investigator for the Department of Revenue, investigator for the Illinois Gaming Board, investigator for the Secretary of State, or arson investigator to pay a specified amount to the System to establish that eligible creditable service, provides that the amount shall include the difference between the amount of employee and employer contributions transferred to the System under the provisions and the amounts that would have been contributed had such contributions been made at the rates applicable to State policemen (rather than investigators for the Department of Revenue or investigators for the Illinois Gaming Board). Makes conforming changes.
Title
PENCD-SERS-ALTERNATIVE FORMULA
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0856 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Belt |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-108.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-139.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-121.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |