IL SB3716 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Flood Control Act of 1945. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall waive its rules requiring the submission of a U.S. Army Corps of Engineers study for levee modification permits for levee and drainage districts located in counties under the disaster proclamation signed by the Governor related to disastrous flooding from May 3, 2019 to July 26, 2019. Provides that in the absence of a written objection from the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers or the submission of a study by the Department showing adverse impact, all permit requests that comply with all statutory requirements shall be approved. Effective immediately.
Title
FLOOD CONTROL-RULE WAIVER
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3716&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3716.htm |