IL SB3706 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Crematory Regulation Act, the Cemetery Oversight Act, the Illinois Health Information Exchange and Technology Act, and the Radiation Protection Act of 1990 from January 1, 2021 to January 1, 2031. Effective immediately.
Title
SUNSET EXTENSION-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.31 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3706&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3706.htm |