IL SB3677 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2022, a store may not sell or distribute in this State a disposable food service container that is composed in whole or in part of polystyrene foam. Directs the Environmental Protection Agency to adopt rules to implement the amendatory Act's provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-POLYSTYRENE FOAM BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2020-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2020-02-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2020-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2020-02-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback