IL SB3663 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that the number of professional development hours required is reduced by 20% for any renewal cycle that includes the 2021-2022 school year. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-REPORTING REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] |
Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0852 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rezin |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 010-001-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.192 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |