IL SB3651 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0849
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that when assessing payment for any amount due under a provision requiring an additional employer contribution for certain earnings increases, IMRF shall exclude reportable earnings increases resulting from periods where the member was paid through workers' compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0849 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-001-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |